Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Monti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1853Born
29 Nov 189542.2AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1 Dec 189542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
20 Dec 190249.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
30 Dec 190249.2ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
30 Dec 190249.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
31 Oct 190754.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Chile
24 Jun 190955.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Monti
Archbishop Pietro Monti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenzano, Suburbicarian See of Albano
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGenzano, Suburbicarian See of Albano

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108, and Page 553
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 68
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 10 Mar 2018