Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Michele Jannachino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

Titular Bishop of Lorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1839BornSturno
19 Sep 186324.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189556.6AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Dec 189556.6Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
12 Jan 191878.7ResignedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
12 Jan 191878.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorium
26 Jan 192080.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Michele Jannachino:
Bishop Angelo Michele Jannachino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 546

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013