Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Balestra, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1841Born
29 Nov 185817.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
13 Dec 186322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Nov 189554.5AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
1 Dec 189554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
17 Dec 190059.6AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 May 191270.9DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Balestra (VIAF: 72581738)
Archbishop Pietro Balestra O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolini di Triora, Diocese of Ventimiglia
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114, and Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017