Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Berti, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1868BornPopiglio
1885²16.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Aug 189022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
31 Aug 190739.6AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
20 Oct 190739.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
13 Apr 190840.2InstalledBishop of Amelia, Italy
19 May 192153.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Narni, Italy
18 Dec 192153.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Narni, Italy
1 Jul 193870.4ResignedBishop of Amelia, Italy
1 Jul 193870.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
22 Feb 194476.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Berti:
Bishop Francesco Maria Berti O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1907, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013