Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Batista Corrêa Nery (Neri)

Deceased

Bishop of Campinas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1863BornCampinas
21 Feb 188622.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Apr 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 189632.9AppointedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
1 Nov 189633.1Ordained BishopBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
18 May 190137.6AppointedBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
3 Aug 190844.8AppointedBishop of Campinas, Brazil
1 Feb 192056.3DiedBishop of Campinas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Batista Corrêa Nery (Neri):
Bishop João Batista Corrêa Nery (Neri) (born , died ) Bishop of Campinas

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 468, and Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013