Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Maria Miniati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1839BornFirenze
14 Jun 186223.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189455.3AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
29 Apr 190970.2ResignedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
29 Apr 190970.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
17 Mar 191879.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Maria Miniati:
Archbishop Emilio Maria Miniati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara

  • a priest for 55.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013