Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Balzano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Termoli, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1829Born
12 Mar 185324.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189364.0AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
22 Jan 189364.0Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
29 Apr 190980.3ResignedBishop of Termoli, Italy
29 Apr 190980.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
12 Dec 191081.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Balzano
Bishop Angelo Balzano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel di Sangro, Diocese of Trivento
Ordained BishopS. Pantaleone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCastel di Sangro, Diocese of Trivento

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 549
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017