Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Svampa

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1851Born
4 Apr 187422.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 188735.9AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
29 Jun 188736.0Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
18 May 189442.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189442.9AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
21 May 189442.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
10 Aug 190756.1DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Svampa (VIAF: 81763188)
Domenico Cardinal Svampa (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontegranaro, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained PriestLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità ai Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Cemetery, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Current)Salesian church of the Sacred Heart of Jesus, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
  • a cardinal for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 153, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1894
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017