Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Etoga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbalmayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1911²BornNkolmewrut
19 Sep 193928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
3 Jul 195544.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
3 Jul 195544.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
30 Nov 195544.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
24 Jun 196150.5AppointedBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
7 Mar 198776.2RetiredBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
13 Mar 199887.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbalmayo, Cameroon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Etoga:
Bishop Paul Etoga (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbalmayo

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013