Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Douala

Archidioecesis Dualaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Samuel Kleda, Archbishop
  • Christian Wiyghan Tumi, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 March 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 1,200 (463 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 179, Douala, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 3423.714
  • Fax: 3431.837

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Douala
31 March 1931ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cameroun Prefecture Apostolic of Douala (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Douala
27 May 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Douala Vicariate Apostolic of Douala
Diocese of Douala
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Douala Diocese of Douala
18 January 1963Territory LostDiocese of Douala Diocese of Sangmélima (erected)
Archdiocese of Douala
18 March 1982ElevatedDiocese of Douala Archdiocese of Douala
22 March 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Douala Diocese of Edéa (erected)
22 March 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Douala Diocese of Eséka (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Douala
1950153,793400,00038.4%2552771,99744ap1951
Diocese of Douala
1969177,800421,40042.2%97481451,22679510134ap1971
1980521,8601,200,00043.5%64421064,923158417245ap1981
Archdiocese of Douala
1990810,0001,920,00042.2%75251008,100144612064ap1991
1999494,0401,950,00025.3%5937965,14636216127ap2000
2000500,1121,900,00026.3%72331054,76225716027ap2001
2001506,1321,900,00026.6%6929985,16425215928ap2002
2002515,8972,000,00025.8%82301124,60627915830ap2003
2003522,9392,500,00020.9%84311154,54714817333ap2004
2004530,3572,500,00021.2%92421343,95716319033ap2005
2006552,3142,591,00021.3%109531623,4099733238ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 14 Sep 2013