Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marie Alphonse Bonneau, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Douala, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1903Born
14 Jul 192926.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Dec 192926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Dec 194643.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Douala, Cameroon
12 Dec 194643.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
16 Feb 194743.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
14 Sep 195552.1AppointedBishop of Douala, Cameroon
27 Jan 195753.5DiedBishop of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marie Alphonse Bonneau
Bishop Pierre Marie Alphonse Bonneau C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Douala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Épesses, Diocese of Luçon, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopDouala, Vicariate Apostolic of Douala
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Buried Place (Original)Douala, Diocese of Douala

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 4
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast