Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Marie Maanicus, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bangassou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1924BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
16 Jul 195025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Feb 196439.4AppointedBishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic
11 May 196439.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic
21 Dec 200076.2DiedBishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Antoine Marie Maanicus:
Bishop Antoine Marie Maanicus C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Bangassou

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013