Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Ama

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1926Born
4 Jun 195528.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197448.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
12 Dec 197448.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
2 Feb 197548.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
22 Jul 198356.9AppointedBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
20 May 199164.7AppointedBishop of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon
15 Mar 200275.5RetiredBishop of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon
29 Feb 200477.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Ama
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Ama (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ebolowa-Kribi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoundou
Ordained BishopYaoundé, Archdiocese of Yaoundé

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast