Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph-Marie Ndi-Okalla

Bishop-Elect of Mbalmayo, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1957 Born
13 Aug 198325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
27 Dec 201659.0AppointedBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
18 Feb 201759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Ndi-Okalla (VIAF: 24690725)
Father Joseph-Marie Ndi-Okalla (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mbalmayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDouala, Diocese of Douala
Ordained PriestMbalmayo, Diocese of Mbalmayo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mbalmayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jan 2017