Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Charles Lucien Loucheur, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bafia, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1910Born
3 Jul 193827.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Sep 193828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Jul 196554.8AppointedPrefect of Bafia, Cameroon
11 Jan 196857.3AppointedBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
19 Mar 196857.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
21 Dec 197767.2ResignedBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
30 Mar 199887.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bafia, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for André Charles Lucien Loucheur (VIAF: 9899343)
Bishop André Charles Lucien Loucheur C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bafia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoubaix, Diocese of Lille, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopStadium, Bafia, Diocese of Bafia
Death PlaceChevilly-Larue, Diocese of Créteil, France

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1968, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast