Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel-Jules-Joseph-Marie Bernard, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nouakchott, Mauritania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1911Born
3 Jul 193826.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Sep 193826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Mar 195038.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Conakry, Guinea
12 Mar 195038.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegeae
30 Jun 195038.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegeae
18 Jul 195442.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brazzaville, Congo
14 Sep 195543.8AppointedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
2 May 196452.4ResignedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
2 May 196452.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arae in Mauretania
18 Dec 196554.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nouakchott, Mauritania
21 Dec 197362.0ResignedBishop of Nouakchott, Mauritania
2 Jan 199381.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nouakchott, Mauritania

MicroData Summary for Michel-Jules-Joseph-Marie Bernard
Archbishop Michel-Jules-Joseph-Marie Bernard C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nouakchott

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvranches, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Gervais, Basilica, Avranches, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France
Death PlaceChevilly-Larue, Diocese of Créteil, France

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ab/noua: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 44
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast