Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaétan Pasotti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Rajaburi, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Barata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1890Born
18 Mar 191626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Feb 193141.0AppointedSuperior of Rajaburi, Thailand
28 May 193444.3AppointedPrefect of Rajaburi, Thailand
3 Apr 194151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Barata
3 Apr 194151.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rajaburi, Thailand
24 Jun 194151.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barata
3 Sep 195060.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Rajaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Gaétan Pasotti
Bishop Gaétan Pasotti S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Rajaburi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinerolo Po, Diocese of Tortona, Italy
Ordained BishopBangkok

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 33
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast