Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Bzdel, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1930BornWishart
24 Sep 194818.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Aug 195222.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Feb 195423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Jul 195423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Dec 199262.4AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
9 Mar 199362.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
9 Jan 200675.4RetiredArchbishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
3 Apr 201281.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Bzdel:
Archbishop Michael Bzdel C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • prof/sole/c01: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 7 Feb 2015