Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Soroka

Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1951 BornWinnipeg
13 Jun 198230.6Ordained PriestPriest of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
29 Mar 199644.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
29 Mar 199644.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acarassus
13 Jun 199644.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acarassus
29 Nov 200049.0AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
27 Feb 200149.3InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Soroka:
Archbishop Stephen Soroka (born ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013