Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Wiwchar, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1932 Born
27 Sep 195321.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Sep 195725.3Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
28 Jun 195927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 199361.1AppointedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
28 Sep 199361.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
20 Nov 200068.5AppointedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
9 Dec 200068.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
25 Mar 200370.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
2 May 200875.9RetiredBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Wiwchar
Bishop Michael Wiwchar C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saskatoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomarno

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,134
  • prof/sole/c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast