Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew J. Roborecki

Deceased

Bishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1910Born
18 Jul 193423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Canada (Ukrainian)
14 Feb 194837.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Central Canada (Ukrainian)
14 Feb 194837.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanais
27 May 194837.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanais
10 Mar 195140.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
3 Nov 195645.8AppointedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
24 Oct 198271.8DiedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Andrew J. Roborecki
Bishop Andrew J. Roborecki (born , died ) Bishop of Saskatoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMosty Welyki

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 56
  • opd/c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast