Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian)

Eparchia Edmontonensis Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • David Motiuk, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Western Canada (Ukrainian)
19 January 1948ErectedApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Western Canada (Ukrainian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
10 March 1951Name ChangedApostolic Exarchate of Western Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
3 November 1956ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Edmonton (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
27 June 1974Territory LostEparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian) Eparchy of New Westminster (Ukrainian) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Western Canada (Ukrainian)
1950310,4281,360,97222.8%3324575,446294325ap1951
Apostolic Exarchate of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian)
196651,9852,998,6521.7%442367775284944ap1967
196851,9852,998,6521.7%452469753344940ap1971
197641,1103317508223293526ap1977
198041,0653015459124273527ap1981
199040,150299381,05692779ap1991
199926,25025123770982635117ap2000
200026,25026144065673235117ap2001
200126,25026133967373135119ap2002
200226,2502615416407223589ap2003
200326,2502514396739253489ap2004
200426,25027154262552433119ap2005
200628,75026133973742230118ap2007
200928,8452913426863242886ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 31 Dec 2011