Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Joseph Eustace

Deceased

Bishop of Camden, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1887BornNew York, NY
1 Nov 191427.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193750.2AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
25 Mar 193850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
11 Dec 1956³69.2DiedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Joseph Eustace:
Bishop Bartholomew Joseph Eustace (born , died ) Bishop of Camden

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013