Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Jules Joseph Marie Barbu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1914BornHénanbihen
11 Jul 193723.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 196853.8AppointedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
12 May 196854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 May 198974.9RetiredBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
16 Mar 199176.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Francis Jules Joseph Marie Barbu:
Bishop Francis Jules Joseph Marie Barbu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015