Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Joseph Marie Raymond Guillon, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1932BornSaint-Joseph-du-Dresny
5 May 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
17 Mar 198855.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
10 Apr 198856.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 May 198957.0SucceededBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
7 Dec 200775.6RetiredBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
9 Jul 201078.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Clément Joseph Marie Raymond Guillon:
Bishop Clément Joseph Marie Raymond Guillon C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2007
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,534
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013