Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Joseph-Marie Le Bellec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

Titular Bishop of Tela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1890BornPloubazlanec
21 Dec 191222.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 194151.6AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
11 Dec 194151.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
24 Sep 196474.6RetiredBishop of Vannes, France
24 Sep 196474.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
13 Oct 197080.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Joseph-Marie Le Bellec:
Bishop Eugène-Joseph-Marie Le Bellec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013