Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves Jean Marie Arsène Boivineau

Bishop of Annecy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1947 Born
23 Jun 197326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
7 May 200154.2AppointedBishop of Annecy, France
26 Aug 200154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Yves Jean Marie Arsène Boivineau
Bishop Yves Jean Marie Arsène Boivineau (born ) Bishop of Annecy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdelay Les Herbiers

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Annecy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,030
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast