Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Étienne Sauvage

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Annecy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1908Born
26 May 193425.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 196253.9AppointedBishop of Annecy, France
3 Nov 196254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
27 Sep 198374.9RetiredBishop of Annecy, France
29 Oct 199183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Étienne Sauvage (VIAF: 34511258)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Étienne Sauvage (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Annecy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcq-en-Baroeul

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jul 2018

Quantcast