Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Germain Perrier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1933Born
29 Jun 195724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tarentaise, France
15 Apr 198854.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
15 Apr 198854.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
17 Jul 198855.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
16 May 200066.8AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
24 Jun 200874.9RetiredBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
2 Oct 201784.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

MicroData Summary for Marcel Germain Perrier (VIAF: 225092337)
Bishop Marcel Germain Perrier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLadray, Arêches, Diocese of Tarentaise
Ordained PriestCathedral, Moûtiers, Diocese of Tarentaise
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)
Death PlaceMaison diocésaine, Moûtiers, Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)
Buried Place (Original)Family Plot, Cemetery, Arêches-Beaufort, Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,726
  • d: CB, 3 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast