Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philibert Randriambololona, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Fianarantsoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1927 BornAnjozorobe
11 Oct 195427.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
30 Jul 196134.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 196840.8Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Sep 198861.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
27 Nov 198861.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
19 Jun 198962.1SucceededBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
17 Dec 199265.6AppointedArchbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
1 Oct 200275.4RetiredArchbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Philibert Randriambololona:
Archbishop Philibert Randriambololona S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fianarantsoa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Aug 2014