Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gerald Neville, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar

Titular Bishop of Carrhae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1858BornDublin, Ireland
1 Nov 188527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1 Sep 191354.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
1 Sep 191354.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
28 Oct 191355.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
8 Mar 193071.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
27 Feb 194384.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John Gerald Neville:
Bishop John Gerald Neville C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013