Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Antananarivo

Archidioecesis Antananarivensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 1989
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 12,500 (4,828 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, Andohalo, B.P. 3030, Antananarivo 101, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020) 222.07.26
  • Fax: 226.41.81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Madagascar
1841ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Bourbon Prefecture Apostolic of Madagascar (erected)
4 September 1848Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Madagascar Prefecture Apostolic of Isole di Mayotta, Nossi-Bé e Comore (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Madagascar
1848ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Madagascar
16 January 1896Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Madagascar {Madagascar Settentrionale} (erected)
16 January 1896Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}
1898Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}
10 May 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa (erected)
15 May 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Betafó (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
20 May 1913Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
18 June 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Prefecture Apostolic of Vatomandry (erected)
8 January 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava (erected)
Archdiocese of Tananarive
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tananarive Archdiocese of Tananarive
21 May 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Diégo-Suarez
Archdiocese of Tananarive
Diocese of Ambatondrazaka (erected)
Archdiocese of Antananarivo
28 October 1989Name ChangedArchdiocese of Tananarive Archdiocese of Antananarivo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
1950149,272590,00025.3%30721021,4631132138ap1951
Archdiocese of Tananarive
1970296,185968,24330.6%48971452,04226842834ap1971
1980354,5041,001,69835.4%47791262,81316341139ap1981
Archdiocese of Antananarivo
1990440,2561,903,87823.1%51931443,05724560952ap1991
1999652,3332,626,41224.8%752533281,9884951,42661ap2000
2000679,8202,678,94125.4%902463362,0235711,29266ap2001
2001693,4162,732,52025.4%921582502,7735691,51866ap2002
2002722,9772,746,72226.3%1021902922,4754561,39368ap2003
2003749,5252,760,93127.1%1151762912,5755261,42268ap2004
2004761,9622,816,14927.1%1131642772,7505031,50968ap2005
2006814,1143,005,03927.1%1191472663,0604041,66768ap2007
2012905,9603,363,00026.9%1431492923,1024841,96270ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013