Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michael Cardinal Logue

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1840Born
Dec 1866³26.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 187938.6AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
20 Jul 187938.8Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
19 Apr 188746.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
19 Apr 188746.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
3 Dec 188747.1SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
16 Jan 189352.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189352.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
19 Nov 192484.1DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Logue (VIAF: 86202792)
Michael Cardinal Logue (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuringings, Diocese of Raphoe
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopPro-Cathderal, Letterkenny, Diocese of Raphoe
Death PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's, Cemetery, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
  • a cardinal for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476, and Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017