Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Victor Cardinal Razafimahatratra, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1921Born
28 Jul 195634.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 196341.4Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Jan 197149.3AppointedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
18 Apr 197149.6Ordained BishopBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
10 Apr 197654.5AppointedArchbishop of Tananarive, Madagascar
24 May 197654.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197654.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
6 Oct 199372.0DiedArchbishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Victor Razafimahatratra
Victor Cardinal Razafimahatratra S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Antananarivo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbanitsilena-Ranomasina

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • a cardinal for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017