Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patrick Joseph Cardinal O’Donnell

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1856Born
29 Jun 188023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Raphoe, Ireland
21 Feb 188831.2AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
3 Apr 188831.3Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
14 Jan 192265.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
14 Jan 192265.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
19 Nov 192467.9SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
14 Dec 192569.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 192569.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
22 Oct 192770.9DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph O’Donnell (VIAF: 107989194)
Patrick Joseph Cardinal O’Donnell (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilraine, near Glenties, Diocese of Raphoe
Ordained PriestMaynooth
Ordained BishopPro-Cathderal, Letterkenny, Diocese of Raphoe
Death PlaceCarlingford, Archdiocese of Armagh
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's, Cemetery, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1925
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,049
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476
  • ob: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017