Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel McGettigan

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1815³Born
26 May 183923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Raphoe, Ireland
29 Feb 185640.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland
29 Feb 185640.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
18 May 185640.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
1 May 186145.4SucceededBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
11 Mar 187054.3AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 Dec 188772.0DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel McGettigan
Archbishop Daniel McGettigan (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMevagh, County Donegal
Ordained BishopLetterkenny
Buried Place (Original)Saint Patrick's Cathedral, Cemetery, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123, and Page 284
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017