Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Pelt

Deceased

Bishop of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1863BornBlettange
18 Dec 188623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Metz, France
24 Apr 191956.0SelectedBishop of Metz, France
1 Aug 191956.3ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
29 Sep 191956.5Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
10 Sep 193774.4DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Pelt: VIAF:59165990
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Pelt (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013