Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Meunier

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1844Born
19 Dec 186824.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189854.1SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
24 Mar 189854.2ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
29 Jun 189854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
11 Jan 191369.0DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Meunier (VIAF: 39458690)
Bishop Philippe Meunier (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalvi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Evreux, Diocese of Evreux
Death PlaceEvreux, Diocese of Evreux

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast