Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthe-Joseph Jalabert, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Titular Bishop of Thelepte

Prefect of Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1859Born
4 Mar 188222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Feb 190949.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
13 Feb 190949.2AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
13 Feb 190949.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
1 May 190949.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
12 Jan 192060.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe-Joseph Jalabert
Bishop Hyacinthe-Joseph Jalabert C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambéry, France

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast