Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Laurent-Benjamin Morelle

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1849BornLe Plessier-Rozainvillers
20 Dec 187324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Amiens, France
13 Jul 190657.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
26 Aug 190657.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
10 Jan 192373.7DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Laurent-Benjamin Morelle:
Bishop Jules-Laurent-Benjamin Morelle (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013