Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Congregatio pro Doctrina Fidei



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Francisco Ladaria Ferrer, S.J., Cardinal, Prefect
  • Giacomo Morandi, Secretary
  • Joseph Augustine Di Noia, O.P., Adjunct Secretary
  • Charles Jude Scicluna, Adjunct Secretary
  • Matteo Visioli, Under Secretary
  • José Luis Mollaghan, Official
  • William Joseph Levada, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • Gerhard Ludwig Müller, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Congregation
  • Name Changed: 7 December 1965
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: promote and safeguard the doctrine on faith and morals in the whole Catholic world; so it has competence in things that touch this matter in any way. (Pastor Bonus, 48)
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/congregations/cfaith/
  • Official Web Site: http://www.doctrinafidei.va/
  • Mailing Address: Piazza della stessa Congregaziione, 00120 Citta del Vaticano, Italy
  • Telephone: 06.69.89.59.11
  • Fax: 06.69.88.34.09

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation for Universal Inquisition
21 July 1542ErectedCongregation for Universal Inquisition (erected)
Congregation of the Holy Office
1908Name ChangedCongregation for Universal Inquisition Congregation of the Holy Office
Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
7 December 1965Name ChangedCongregation of the Holy Office Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
19 January 2019Territory AddedPontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” (suppressed) Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast