Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Spada

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1643BornRoma, Italy
22 Dec 166926.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 167229.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
14 Aug 167229.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
15 Aug 167229.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
Jan 1674³30.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
6 Jan 167430.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
27 May 167532.1Elevated to Cardinal
27 Aug 167532.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
23 Mar 167633.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
23 May 168946.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
14 Jul 169148.3AppointedSecretary of State
1698²54.7AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
1699¹55.7ResignedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
27 Sep 170057.5ResignedSecretary of State
4 Dec 170057.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
30 Apr 170865.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
19 Feb 171066.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1716²72.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
15 Jun 171774.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Spada (VIAF: 59091261)
Fabrizio Cardinal Spada (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
  • a cardinal for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 19
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016