Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Parente

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1891BornCasalnuovo Monterotaro
18 Mar 191625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
15 Sep 195564.5AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Oct 195564.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Oct 195968.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
23 Oct 195968.6AppointedOfficial of the Congregation of the Holy Office
7 Dec 196574.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
196775.8ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
26 Jun 196776.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
26 Jun 196776.3Elevated to Cardinal
29 Dec 198695.8DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Pietro Parente:
Pietro Cardinal Parente (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Doctrine of the Faith

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015