Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfredo Cardinal Ottaviani

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1890Born
18 Mar 191625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Jun 192938.6AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
19 Dec 193545.1ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
12 Jan 195362.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195362.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
15 Jan 195362.2AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
7 Nov 195969.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
5 Apr 196271.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berrhoea
19 Apr 196271.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berrhoea
19 Apr 196271.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Berrhoea
9 Feb 196675.2AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
26 Jun 196776.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Domnica
8 Jan 196877.1RetiredPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
3 Aug 197988.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Ottaviani (VIAF: 22159609)
Alfredo Cardinal Ottaviani (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Doctrine of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 31
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast