Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Ferrata

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1847BornGradoli
18 Sep 186922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Montefiascone, Italy
1884²36.8AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
2 Apr 188538.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
14 Apr 188538.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
19 Apr 188538.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
20 Apr 188942.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
23 Jun 189144.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
22 Jun 189649.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 189649.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
19 Jun 189952.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
20 Nov 189952.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
19 Apr 190053.1ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
23 Oct 190053.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
27 Nov 190255.7AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
26 Oct 190861.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacraments
7 Apr 191366.1AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
2 Jan 191466.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
4 Sep 191467.5AppointedSecretary of State
10 Oct 191467.6DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ferrata:
Cardinal Domenico Ferrata (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 550, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013