Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Luis Mollaghan

Official of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1946 BornBuenos Aires
19 Mar 197124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Jul 199347.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Jul 199347.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Theuzi
2 Oct 199347.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theuzi
17 May 200054.0AppointedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
5 Aug 200054.3InstalledBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
22 Dec 200559.6AppointedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
18 Mar 200659.9InstalledArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
19 May 201468.0AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

MicroData Summary for José Luis Mollaghan:
Archbishop José Luis Mollaghan (born ) Official of Doctrine of the Faith

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,176
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 May 2014