Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Maria (Tommaso Francesco) Cardinal Bilio, B. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1826Born
1842²15.7ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
1849²22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
22 Jun 186640.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 186640.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
22 Dec 187347.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 Jan 187447.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 Jul 187650.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
20 Dec 187650.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
18 Oct 187751.5AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Jan 188356.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
30 Jan 188457.8DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria (Tommaso Francesco) Bilio (VIAF: 36000020)
Luigi Maria (Tommaso Francesco) Cardinal Bilio B. (born , died ) Secretary of Universal Inquisition

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria, Italy
Ordained PriestVercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli, Italy
Ordained BishopHall of the Consistory, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Barnabite Tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 5
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017