Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santo MarcianÚ

Archbishop of Italy, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1960 BornReggio Calabria
24 Oct 198727.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
9 Apr 198828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
6 May 200646.1AppointedArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
21 Jun 200646.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
22 Jul 200646.3InstalledArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
10 Oct 201353.5AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military

MicroData Summary for Santo MarcianÚ:
Archbishop Santo MarcianÚ (born ) Archbishop of Italy, Military

Please contact the Archbishop through the Military Ordinariate of Italy, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,170
  • ab/c0: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 10 Feb 2014