Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvio Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1550BornAriccia
26 Jan 158231.5AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1589²38.4ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
28 Mar 159443.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
5 Jun 159645.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159645.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
22 Jan 159948.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvio Savelli:
Cardinal Silvio Savelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013