Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Sassi

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1612AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
9 Dec 1612Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
9 Jan 1615DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Sassi:
Archbishop Mario Sassi (died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 297
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 54, Number 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013